This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2022 at 04:02:17 (UTC).

JASMIN RAMOS VS INTERLANG, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 JASMIN RAMOS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against INTERLANG, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3133

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS JASMIN

Defendant

INTERLANG LLC DBA MONTGOMERY DME A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FUND CATHRYN G. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HAUBRICH JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/8/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO ARBITRATION

12/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO ARBITRATION

Answer

10/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling

5/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Completion of Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jasmin Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Completion of Arbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Completion of Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO SUBMIT MATTER TO ARBITRATION); Filed by Interlang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Interlang, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jasmin Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jasmin Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jasmin Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jasmin Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUND CATHRYN G.