This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 16:04:29 (UTC).

JARED CHRISTOPHER PECHT VS PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 JARED CHRISTOPHER PECHT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5249

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PECHT JARED CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

PLB MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PRIME PARK LABREA TITLEHOLDER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2024
  • Hearing09/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jared Christopher Pecht (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jared Christopher Pecht (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jared Christopher Pecht (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLB MANAGEMENT A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Prime/Park Labrea Titleholder, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN