This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 02:16:40 (UTC).

JARAMILLO, MONICA VS CAMACHO, LUIS M

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 JARAMILLO, MONICA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CAMACHO, LUIS M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, H. DON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1240

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, H. DON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JARAMILLO MONICA

Respondent

CAMACHO LUIS M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MITCHELL ROSSANA PILAR

Respondent Attorney

SHAFER ROGER S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/12/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/12/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

RFO/MTN - Child Support - RFO/MTN - Child Support

5/10/2022: RFO/MTN - Child Support - RFO/MTN - Child Support

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

5/10/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/1/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

3/3/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/3/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/20/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/20/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Service

FCS-Mediation Memo

10/4/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/8/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

10/8/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

10/8/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Minute Order

10/8/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail

10/29/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Domestic Violence

10/29/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/1/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department C at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department C at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; RFO - Child Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Child Support (RFO/MTN - Child Support ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL ROSSANA PILAR