This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 06:12:58 (UTC).

JARAMILLO, JONATHAN - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 JARAMILLO, JONATHAN - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6743

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAHENA MARGARITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS WARREN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

7/8/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

7/8/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

7/8/2021: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

7/14/2021: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

7/14/2021: Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

10/12/2021: Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

10/12/2021: Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketReceipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS WARREN