This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2019 at 01:13:52 (UTC).

JAQUELINE JOE VS EDSON YANER DELCID ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 JAQUELINE JOE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDSON YANER DELCID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5662

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOE JAQUELINE

Defendants and Respondents

DELCID EDSON YANER

DOES 1 TO 10

WIRING CONNECTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JEFFRIES FRANKLIN P.

Defendant Attorney

LOUREIRO KARL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)

8/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/14/2019: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRIAL CONTINUANCE

8/14/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Substitution of Attorney

7/9/2019: Substitution of Attorney

SUMMONS -

2/28/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/28/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

Proof of Service -

7/9/2018: Proof of Service -

ANSWER PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

4/9/2018: ANSWER PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

4/10/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

4/17/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Hearing04/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Hearing04/08/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Dismissal of Action for Failure to Prosecute or in The Alternative, Trial Continuance) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Dismissal of Action for Failure to Prosecute or in The Alternative, Trial Continuance) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketANSWER PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edson Yaner Delcid (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Edson Yaner Delcid (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jaqueline Joe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaqueline Joe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695662    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAQUELINE JOE,

Plaintiff,

vs.

EDSON YANER DEL CID, ET AL.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC695662

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL; GRANTING MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED; GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; SANCTIONS

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 25, 2020

Defendant Edson Yaner Del Cid’s Motions to Compel are Granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified response to the outstanding discovery, without objections, within twenty days. Defendant’s Motion to Deem RFAs Admitted is Granted. Defendant’s Motion to Compel deposition of Plaintiff Jaqueline Joe is Granted. Defendant’s request for sanctions is granted in the reduced amount of $1,034.90. Plaintiff and her attorney of record, jointly and severally, are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through counsel of record, in the amount of $1,034.90 within twenty days.

Defendant propounded special interrogatories, form interrogatories, RFAs, and RPDs and Plaintiff on September 30, 2019. To date, Plaintiff have not served response. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions. No opposition was filed.

Defendant’s motions to compel are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within twenty days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b). Defendant also moves to deem RFAs admitted. The motion is granted. CCP §2033.280(b).

On October 17, 2019, Defendant served a Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents. It was noticed for November 4, 2019. The deposition was eventually taken off calendar due to opposing counsel being unable to contact his client and his inability to provide alternative dates. Defendant’s counsel corresponded with Plaintiff’s counsel to set an alternative deposition date with no avail. Subsequently, on December 2, 2019, Defendant’s counsel served a second Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff and Request for Production of Documents. It was noticed for December 17, 2019. One day before the scheduled deposition date, Plaintiff’s counsel emailed Defendant’s counsel stating that he had trial on December 17, 2019. Plaintiff’s counsel requested alternative deposition dates. On December 18, 2019, Defendant’s counsel proceeded with the deposition and obtained a Certificate of Non-Appearance. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff’s deposition and to pay sanctions. No opposition was filed.

The motion to compel deposition is granted.  CCP §2025.450(a).  Plaintiff’s counsel and Defense counsel are ordered to work together to schedule a time, date, and location for Plaintiff’s deposition(s).  The deposition(s) must go forward within twenty days.  If counsels are unable to resolve this issue, Defendant’s counsel may set the deposition on Defendant’s counsel’s terms with ten days’ notice to Plaintiff’s counsel (additional notice per Code if notice is by other than personal service). 

Sanctions are mandatory. CCP §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c), 2033.280(c), 2025.450(c).  Defendant seeks sanctions in varying amounts in connection with the two motions.  The Court finds one and half hour to prepare each of these motions to compel is sufficient to compensate Defendant. No oppositions were filed; thus, no reply is needed.  The Court awards one hour to appear at the hearing on the motion.  The Court therefore awards a total of four hours of attorney time at $175/hour, or $700 in attorneys’ fees.  The Court also awards $334.90 in costs associated with the December 17, 2019 deposition. CCP §2023.030(a).  Sanctions are sought against and awarded against Plaintiff and her attorney of record, jointly and severally.

Moving party to provide notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at SSCDEPT31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.