This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 08:54:37 (UTC).

JAQUELEEN MADRIGAL VS KELLY BRIANA MILES

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 JAQUELEEN MADRIGAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KELLY BRIANA MILES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0312

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADRIGAL JAQUELEEN

Defendant

MILES KELLY BRIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIBA KASEY

SICHI MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

WEISSMAN DAVID MAX

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/17/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

4/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

5/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Kelly Briana Miles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kelly Briana Miles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kelly Briana Miles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jaqueleen Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISSMAN DAVID MAX