This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 13:34:50 (UTC).

JANIS JOLCUVAR, ET AL. VS ARES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 JANIS JOLCUVAR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ARES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3802

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOLCUVAR JANIS

BISHOP DENNIS

Defendants

ARES MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

AVEDA CORPORATION

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

BOBBI BROWN PROFESSIONAL COSMETICS INC.

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC FKA BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC. FKA MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC.

BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY

CASWELL-MASSEY HOLDINGS LLC

CASWELL-MASSEY LLC

CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY

CHANEL INC.

CLINIQUE LABORATORIES INC.

CLINIQUE LABORATORIES LLC

COLOR TECHNIQUES INC.

CONOPCO INC. DBA UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. FDBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO.

ELI LILLY AND COMPANY

ELIZABETH ARDEN INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURDY STUART J.

Defendant Attorneys

D'ORO FRANK J.

GARRATT JUSTIN EDWARD

KATERNDAHL JOHN P.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

LEE JAE HONG

MURRIN CHARLES PATRICK

NICHOLS STEPHEN M.

POPOVICH JERRY C.

UFKES FREDERICK JOHN

ULLOA EDWARD RICHARD

WEISS LINDSAY

WILLIAMSON IAN GARTH

LANGBORD PETER B.

 

Court Documents

Other - - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT UNILVER UNITED STATES, INC. OFF CALLENDAR

9/3/2021: Other - - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT UNILVER UNITED STATES, INC. OFF CALLENDAR

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Answer

7/28/2021: Answer

Answer

7/29/2021: Answer

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT L'OREAL USA INC.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT L'OREAL USA INC.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

8/2/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Answer

8/6/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID SCHWARTZ IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT UNILEVER UNITED STATES INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH

8/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID SCHWARTZ IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT UNILEVER UNITED STATES INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH

Complaint

6/28/2021: Complaint

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction of Specially Appearing Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (CCP 418(A)(1))) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Taking Motion to Quash Service of Summons of Specially Appearing Defendant Unilver United States, Inc. Off Callendar; Filed by Unilever United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction of Specially Appearing Defendant Brenntag Specialties, LLC Re(21STCV23802-Jolcuvar)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction of Specially Appearing Defendant Brenntag North America, Inc. Re(21STCV23802-Jolcuvar)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re: Motions to Quash Service of Summons); Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Janis Jolcuvar (Plaintiff); Dennis Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Color Techniques Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Aveda Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Elizabeth Arden Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. FDBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO. is a litigant