This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 01:36:39 (UTC).

JANICE MADARANG ET AL VS VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 JANICE MADARANG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7336

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MADARAN JUDY

MADARANG JANICE

MADARANG JUDY AS HEIR AND SUCCESSOR IN

MADARANG JANICE AS HEIR AND SUCCESSOR IN

Respondents and Defendants

JAVIER JOHN

PROGRESSIVE HEALTH CARE

VILLA ELENA PROPERTIES

VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER

GOINGS & GOINGS INC

VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC

ADVANTAGE WOUND CARE

BRENDA CARASI

ALIKSANIAN M.D. DR LORI

LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC.

GOINGS & GOINGS INC.

ALIKSANIAN M.D. LORI DR

CARE ADVANTAGE WOUND

ROBERT MARRIOT MEDICAL CORP. PC ERRONEOUS

VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC.

Decedent

MADARANG TERESA

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YEROUSHALMI BEN ESQ.

YEROUSHALMI & YEROUSHALMI

Defendant Attorneys

PLEISS CASEY SITAR & ROSS

ARBUTHNOT ERICKSEN

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

ERICKSEN & ARBUTHNOT

WROTEN & ASSOCIATES INC.

CREASON & AARVIG LLP

PLEISS SITAR MCGRATH HUNTER & HALLACK

CREASON TUCKER ALEXANDER LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/4/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

5/11/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

5/15/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

5/16/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

5/22/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/30/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

5/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/8/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/9/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

6/13/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

6/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/3/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/3/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/6/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/6/2017: Unknown

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

7/13/2017: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Minute Order

7/13/2017: Minute Order

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING DISMISSAL OF ALLOPERATIVE PLEADINGS/PARTIES;C/F 07/10/18**DISM 08/30/18 EA W/PREJ**) - Discharged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal ( ENTIRE ACTION W/PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by TERESA MADARANG (Legacy Party); MADARANG, JANICE as heir and successor in (Plaintiff); MADARANG, JUDY as heir and successor in (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; (Motion; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • at 01:30 pm in Department C, Lori Ann Fournier, Presiding; Motion (FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITHSETTLEMENTADVANCED PER CRS ON 7/02/18) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
289 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2017
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc (Defendant); Goings & Goings, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DECLARATION OF JOANN TOWNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Janice Madarang (Plaintiff); MADARANG, JANICE as heir and successor in (Plaintiff); Judy Madaran (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) DEPENDENT ABUSE AND NEGLECT (PURSUANT TO THE ELDER ADULT AND DEPENDENT ADULT CIVIL PROTECTION ACT - WELFARE AND INSTITUTION CODE SECTIONS 15600 ET SEQ.);ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less