This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 03:55:18 (UTC).

JANET ZATURYAN VS GOLDEN WEST ALLIANCE, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 JANET ZATURYAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GOLDEN WEST ALLIANCE, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0755

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZATURYAN JANET

Defendants

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC.

GOLDEN WEST ALLIANCE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENSAFI LALEH

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN AARON R.

PFEIFER MICHAEL RAY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

2/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.

11/17/2020: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 11/04/2020

11/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 11/04/2020

Request for Refund / Order

10/2/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Proof of Service by Mail

10/23/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Janet Zaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Golden West Alliance, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Golden West Alliance, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.); Filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Janet Zaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Janet Zaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Janet Zaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Laleh Ensafi (Attorney); Janet Zaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laleh Ensafi (Attorney); Janet Zaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Laleh Ensafi (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less