Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 08:28:42 (UTC).

JANET REITER, ET AL. VS JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 JANET REITER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0366

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REITER LAWRENCE P.

REITER JANET

Defendants

QUARTZ HILL STATION LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMONTREE DARREN BURKE

Defendant Attorney

KIM SUE H.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/19/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

2/22/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION

1/25/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION

1/25/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

1/25/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION

1/25/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT FURTHER DISCOVERY) - 1 MOVING PARTY, 1 MOTION

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/8/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/8/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Defendants' Response to Form Interrogatories and Seeking Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Defendants' Response to Special Interrogatories and Seeking Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Defendants' Response to Request for Production and Seeking Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Defendants' Response to Special Interrogatories and Seeking Sanctions); Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Defendants' Response to Form Interrogatories and Seeking Sanctions); Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Defendants' Response to Request for Production and Seeking Sanctions); Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Quartz Hill Station LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Janet Reiter (Plaintiff); Lawrence P. Reiter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM SUE H.