This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 14:14:21 (UTC).

JANET LEVY ROSS VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 JANET LEVY ROSS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6418

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSS JANET LEVY

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

SOUTHWIND VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC AKA ?THE CAPE? HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

BENNETT ENTERPRISES A CALIFORNIA LANDSCAPE CONTRACTING CORPORATION DBA BENNETT

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TREE AND LANDSCAPE INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SOUTHWIND VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC AKA ?THE CAPE? HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOCAJ ADAM

Defendant Attorneys

HAYES FREDERICK BREVARD

SOLARES ERICK LEONEL

DILTS GREGORY A.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/19/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/9/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR STATEMENT SETTING FORTH THE NATURE AND AMOUNT OF DAMAGES BEING SOUGHT (C.C.P. SECTION 425.22)

12/8/2021: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR STATEMENT SETTING FORTH THE NATURE AND AMOUNT OF DAMAGES BEING SOUGHT (C.C.P. SECTION 425.22)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

6/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

6/23/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/2/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

5/21/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/9/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demand for Jury Trial

4/13/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Cross-Complaint

4/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/13/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Unavailability Of Counsel; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); The People of The State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); As to: Janet Levy Ross (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: The People of The State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); As to: Janet Levy Ross (Plaintiff); CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); SOUTHWIND VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 31 - Hon. Paul Bruguera; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 31 - Hon. Audra Mori; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/17/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/29/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SOUTHWIND VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Janet Levy Ross (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Janet Levy Ross (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Janet Levy Ross (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 02/18/2021 to 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 02/18/2021 to 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 02/18/2021 to 02/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bennett Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOCAJ ADAM