This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 01:44:23 (UTC).

JANET HELTSLEY VS ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 JANET HELTSLEY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6496

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELTSLEY JANET

Defendants

ADECCO USA INC.

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS INC.

THE ADECCO GROUP

FREDERICKS KIMBERLEY STARRATT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAHMAN ESQ. IMRAN A.

MANCINI MARCUS A.

YEREMENKO VADIM

Defendant Attorney

GORDON GABRIELLE E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Settlement

9/1/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/02/2021

9/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/02/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/03/2021

9/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/03/2021

Request for Dismissal

9/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/19/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Answer

6/10/2020: Answer

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:39 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:25 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 4:08 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Accounting Principals, Inc. (Defendant); Adecco USA, Inc. (Defendant); Kimberley Starratt Fredericks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Janet Heltsley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less