This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 17:54:14 (UTC).

JANESSA HINDSON, BY AND THROUGH GAL, ET AL. VS ST. PAUL HIGH SCHOOL, A BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 JANESSA HINDSON, BY AND THROUGH GAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ST PAUL HIGH SCHOOL, A BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0422

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HINDSON REBECCA

Defendant

ST. PAUL HIGH SCHOOL A BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN WILLIAM W.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

9/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JANESSA HINDSON, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); REBECCA HINDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JANESSA HINDSON, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); REBECCA HINDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JANESSA HINDSON, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); REBECCA HINDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JANESSA HINDSON, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); REBECCA HINDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN WILLIAM WARREN