This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 16:34:17 (UTC).

JANE WOODWORTH VS WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 JANE WOODWORTH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WELLS FARGO COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6294

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODWORTH JANE

Defendants

ALFARO JERRY

PEREZ LUPE

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION AKA WELLS FARGO BANK N.A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHASE BRIAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Woodworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Woodworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Woodworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO & COMPANY is a litigant