Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 12:02:56 (UTC).

JANE WANG VS FREMONT CABINETS IMPORTS, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 JANE WANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FREMONT CABINETS IMPORTS, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1387

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG JANE

Defendants

LIU WENDY

DE JUAN ZHOU AKA JOSEPH ZHOU

FANG YUE AKA YVONNE FANG

YUAN LI MICHAEL

FREMONT CABINETS IMPORTS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

FANG MICHELLE AKA YI FANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAMRAZ JOEL FRANCIS

TAMARZ JOEL F.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 03/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/24/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for the Plaintiff's Failure to Appear at Order to Show Cause Re Proof of Service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 04/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 03/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMRAZ JOEL FRANCIS