This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 06:52:47 (UTC).

JANE ROE VS STEVE LIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 JANE ROE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STEVE LIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0287

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROE JANE

Defendants

LIM SONNIA

LIM STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAWABATA BLAKE MAKOA

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT

KAWABATA B. MAKOA

Defendant Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 05/26/2021

5/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 05/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

3/15/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 3:07 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Steve Lim (Defendant); Sonnia Lim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jane Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Steve Lim (Defendant); Sonnia Lim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer (- Defendants Steven Lim and Sonnia Lim's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint); Filed by Steve Lim (Defendant); Sonnia Lim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERGER ELLIOT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAWABATA B. MAKOA