This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 21:23:29 (UTC).

JANE N.B. DOE VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 JANE N B DOE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY GREEN and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0604

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY GREEN

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B C

Defendants

GONZALES PAUL

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLRED GLORIA RACHEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

EVANGELISTA VANESSA A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 07/28/2020

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 07/28/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amended Complaint

1/25/2019: Amended Complaint

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/12/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; ORDER TO...)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; ORDER TO...)

Notice of Ruling

12/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BYRON R. LAU REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S NOVEMBER 18, 2019 FILING OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION-MINOR

11/27/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BYRON R. LAU REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S NOVEMBER 18, 2019 FILING OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION-MINOR

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/12/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

11/18/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

11/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

9/25/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM - MINOR

9/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM - MINOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

9/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jane N.B. Doe, et al. on 01/25/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 07/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 07/28/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jane N.B. Doe, et al. on 01/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jane N.B. Doe as to County of Los Angeles Department of Parks and Recreation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jane N.B. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jane N.B. Doe, et al. on 01/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jane N.B. Doe as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2030423 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2030424 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketAddress for Gloria Rachel Allred (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Gloria Rachel Allred, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Jane N.B. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jane N.B. Doe (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Department of Parks and Recreation (Defendant); Paul Gonzales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jane N.B. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Complaint: Status Date changed from 01/25/2019 to 10/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Approve Filing of Complaint Using a Pseudonym for Complaint and the Initials of her Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Jane N.B. Doe (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Department of Parks and Recreation (Defendant); Paul Gonzales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less