This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2022 at 13:29:37 (UTC).

JANE K.C. VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 JANE K C filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0572

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE K.C.

Defendant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Guardian Ad Litem

AYALA JACQUELINE

Interested Party

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

CARRILLO LUIS A. ESQ.

CARRILLO LUIS ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

RUIZ RODOLFO FLORENTINO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION)

7/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION)

Notice of Ruling

7/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF PLAINTIFF JANE K.C. DOE; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

9/11/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF PLAINTIFF JANE K.C. DOE; AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

Notice of Settlement

10/25/2019: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PETITION FOR MINORS COMPROMISE, STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/29/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PETITION FOR MINORS COMPROMISE, STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice - NOTICE OF THE COURT'S ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PETITION FOR MINORS COMPROMISE, STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

11/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF THE COURT'S ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PETITION FOR MINORS COMPROMISE, STATUS CONFERENCE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED DATES AND SETTING OSC HEARING

11/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED DATES AND SETTING OSC HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust

3/6/2020: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/01/2020

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE

5/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

8/13/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

8/13/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order - ORDER RULING

8/13/2020: Order - ORDER RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE (C/F 3-23 CLOSED) (C/F...)

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE (C/F 3-23 CLOSED) (C/F...)

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

10/9/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (and Status Conference reproof of Deposit and proof of Annuities Purchase) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jacqueline Ayala (Legacy Party); Jane K.C. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Jacqueline Ayala (Legacy Party); Jane K.C. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 49; Hearing - Other (Re Minor's Compromise (c/f 3-23 CLOSED) (c/f 6/9 CLOSED)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal (c/f 3-23 CLOSED) (c/f 6/9 CLOSED)) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jane K.C. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Jane K.C. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder (RULING); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re Minor's Compromise (c/f 3-23 CLOSED) (c/f...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal (c/f 3-23 CLOSED)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO SUPERVISE; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO SUPERVISE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane K.C. Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0572    Hearing Date: August 13, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Jane K.C.,

Plaintiff,

Case No.

****0572

v.

Ruling

Los Angeles Unified School Dist., et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: August 13, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise

Moving Party:  Petitioner Jacqueline Ayala

Responding Party:      none

Ruling: The petition is granted. The proposed order will be signed and filed.

The proposed settlement, including the requested attorney fee, is fair and reasonable. Therefore, the petition is granted. The proposed order will be signed and filed. A follow-up date will be set for proof of deposit and annuity purchase.

Date: August 13, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUIZ RODOLFO F. ESQ.