This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:58:24 (UTC).

JANE JM DOE ET AL VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by JANE JM DOE against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0799

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

JIMENEZ ALFONSO

DOES 1 TO 100

TELFAIR ELEMENTARY SCHOOL

CHAPEL PAUL III

ZACARIAS RUBEN

Minor

DOE JANE RH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JULY 24, 2018 MINUTE ORDER OF THE COURT

7/30/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JULY 24, 2018 MINUTE ORDER OF THE COURT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

9/4/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Ruling

11/14/2018: Notice of Ruling

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration

3/4/2019: Declaration

Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

6/14/2019: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULING ON JULY 12, 2018 AND OF CASE TRANSFER/REASSIGNMENT

7/16/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULING ON JULY 12, 2018 AND OF CASE TRANSFER/REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALFONSO JIMENEZ? DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEX E. CUNNY

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALFONSO JIMENEZ? DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEX E. CUNNY

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEX

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEX

PLAINTIFFS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALFONSO JIMENEZ? DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: PLAINTIFFS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALFONSO JIMENEZ? DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT ALFONSO JIMENEZ'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/30/2018: DEFENDANT ALFONSO JIMENEZ'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS NOTIEC OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT;DECLARATION OF HENRY H.GONZALEZ

5/25/2018: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS NOTIEC OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT;DECLARATION OF HENRY H.GONZALEZ

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

3/12/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default as to Defendant Paul Chapel III) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs' Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs' Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiffs' Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs' Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiffs' Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs' Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION, NEGLIGENT HIRING AND/OR RETENTION, NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO WARN TRAIN OR EDUCATE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Admismael Jaramillo (Plaintiff); Carmen Cruz (Plaintiff); Jane JM Doe (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Admismael Jaramillo (Plaintiff); Carmen Cruz (Plaintiff); Jane JM Doe (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690799    Hearing Date: May 05, 2020    Dept: 1

Doe, et al v. LAUSD, et al. (BC690799)
Nature of Proceedings: Hearing on Plaintiff Jane RH Doe’s Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date of Plaintiff’s Minor’s Compromise Petition.
The court has read and considered Plaintiff’s ex parte application to advance the hearing on Plaintiff’s petition to approve minor’s compromise, currently set for hearing on August 19, 2020.
On April 29, 2020, Plaintiff filed the petition to approve compromise of pending action. On May 1, 2020, the court continued the hearing on Plaintiff’s minor’s compromise from May 18, 2020 to August 19, 2020. Plaintiff’s counsel notes the funding deadline for Plaintiff’s annuity is June 15, 2020. (Boren Decl. ¶ 5.)
Plaintiff Jane RH Doe’s Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date of Plaintiff’s Minor’s Compromise Petition is GRANTED.
In an effort to avoid further delay, the court notes Plaintiff solely provided the Spanish version of the Retention Agreement, Attachment 18A to the Petition, in the April 29, 2020 Petition. Plaintiff must file and serve an admissible English translation of the Retention Agreement. (CRC Rule 3.1110(g). See also Evid. Code §§ 750, 751, 753.)
The hearing on Plaintiff Jane RH Doe’s Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action, currently set for August 19, 2020, is hereby advanced and continued to May 18, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 1 of the Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Plaintiff is ordered to file and serve a supplemental declaration with the required translation no later than May 11, 2020.