This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 00:41:20 (UTC).

JANE J.A. DOE VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 JANE J A DOE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VALERIE SALKIN and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6526

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VALERIE SALKIN

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE J.A.

Defendant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUBION DOMINIQUE LEAH

CARRILLO MICHAEL SANTINO

CARRILLO LUIS ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

BACIO GARY ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

5/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2022

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2022

5/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

5/3/2022: Notice of Related Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/27/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

12/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

2/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Answer

2/10/2022: Answer

Notice of Related Case

2/10/2022: Notice of Related Case

Substitution of Attorney

3/2/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

4/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docketat 1:42 PM in Department U, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 05/10/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/10/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketat 11:45 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane J.A. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BACIO GARY A. ESQ.