This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 05:13:50 (UTC).

JANE H ET AL VS JENNIFER KENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 JANE H filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against JENNIFER KENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0526

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

H. JANE

A. MARY

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE

KENT JENNIFER

Other

JAMES E. FITZGERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

WESTERN CENTER ON LAW & POVERTY

PALLACK DAVID SCOTT

FITZGERALD JAMES EUGENE

NEWMAN ROBERT DEXTER JR

Respondent Attorneys

BYERTS MICHAEL E.

BYERTS MICHAEL EDWARD

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM- EX PARTE

2/22/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM- EX PARTE

DECLARATION OF MONA TAWATAO IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

3/15/2018: DECLARATION OF MONA TAWATAO IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/6/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/13/2018: NOTICE REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/22/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Ex Parte Application

11/21/2018: Ex Parte Application

PETITIONERS' STATEMENT RE: STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BIFURCATION OF FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FROM SECOND THROUGH SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION; REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

1/4/2018: PETITIONERS' STATEMENT RE: STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BIFURCATION OF FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FROM SECOND THROUGH SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION; REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF RESPONDENTS JENNIFER KENT AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; DECLARATION OF DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL MICHAEL E. BYERTS

11/20/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF RESPONDENTS JENNIFER KENT AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; DECLARATION OF DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL MICHAEL E. BYERTS

NOTICE OF WRIT OF MANDATE HEARING

11/20/2017: NOTICE OF WRIT OF MANDATE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

11/20/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Minute Order

11/16/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

STIPULATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING NEW PETITIONERS IN AMENDED PETITION TO USE PSEUDONYMS; ORDER

9/28/2017: STIPULATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING NEW PETITIONERS IN AMENDED PETITION TO USE PSEUDONYMS; ORDER

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS (CODE CIV. PROC. 1094.5 AND 1085) AND COMPALINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

8/8/2017: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS (CODE CIV. PROC. 1094.5 AND 1085) AND COMPALINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 10:28 AM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF WRIT HEARING DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by JANE H. (Petitioner); MARY A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 1:32 PM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 82; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Minute Order ((JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF WRIT HEARING DATE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Writ); Filed by JENNIFER KENT (Respondent); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (partial dismissal as the first cause of action only); Filed by JANE H. (Petitioner); MARY A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (to Exceed Page Limits for Opening, Opposition, and Reply Briefs); Filed by JANE H. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by JANE H. (Petitioner); MARY A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JANE H. (Petitioner); MARY A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS (CODE CIV. PROC. 1094.5 AND 1085) AND COMPALINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less