This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 16:06:15 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL FEENEY and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4916

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JILL FEENEY

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

WIESMEIER EDWARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WIESMEIER EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LUSKEY RANDALL

MCGRATH JENNIFER J.

MCGRATH JENNIFER JOANNE ESQ.

LUSKEY RANDALL SCOTT ESQ.

SMITH MARC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/25/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

5/19/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/19/2022: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

5/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

5/12/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/4/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE EXTENSION FOR THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

2/10/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE EXTENSION FOR THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 02/15/2022

2/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 02/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

2/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/28/2022

2/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/28/2022

Notice of Related Case

3/2/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/23/2022

3/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/23/2022

Notice of Ruling

3/25/2022: Notice of Ruling

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edward Wiesmeier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketVerified Application of Jeannie S. Rhee to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Defendant The Regents of he University of California CRC - Rule 9.40; Filed by Randall Scott Luskey, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUSKEY RANDALL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Luskey, Randall Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH MARC ESQ.