This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2022 at 01:41:26 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAWRENCE P. RIFF, AMY D. HOGUE, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, H. JAY FORD III and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

AMY D. HOGUE

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

H. JAY FORD III

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants

HEAPS JAMES M.D.

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CORPORATION

JAMES HEAPS MEDICAL CORPORATION A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAN YOONIS J

RUDIN ERIC GRAHAM

DORSE KEVIN ALFRED

REILLEY JANE ELIZABETH

CHUN MILIN

FINALDI VINCE WILLIAM

GAMLIEL ALEXIS RACHEL

GARZA SHARYL BILAS

KAVINOKY DARREN TODD

MASRYWEEKS LOUANNE

MCGRATH JENNIFER J.

Defendant Attorneys

CICCOLARI-MICALDI SARA

GUTERMAN MARK BRIAN

HOFFMAN MATTHEW ALLAN

KELLY JOHN CHRISTOPHER

SEQUOIA MERCEDES CHELSEA

SMITH MARC

YANG DEBRA W.

DEHAAS LOUIS H. JR

APPLEBY RYAN STEPHEN

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/3/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Stipulation and Order - UNOPPOSED STIPULATION OF THE 312 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS TO APPOINT LIEN RESOLUTION ADMINISTRATOR AND AUTHORIZE DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFFS PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION; [PROPOSED] OR

6/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - UNOPPOSED STIPULATION OF THE 312 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS TO APPOINT LIEN RESOLUTION ADMINISTRATOR AND AUTHORIZE DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFFS PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION; [PROPOSED] OR

Stipulation and Order - UNOPPOSED STIPULATION OF THE 312 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND, APPOINT HON LISA HART COLE (RET.) AS QSF TRUSTEE AND APPOINT EPIQ AS QSF ADMINISTRA

6/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - UNOPPOSED STIPULATION OF THE 312 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND, APPOINT HON LISA HART COLE (RET.) AS QSF TRUSTEE AND APPOINT EPIQ AS QSF ADMINISTRA

Stipulation and Order - UNOPPOSED STIPULATION OF THE 312 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTERS TO APPORTION SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER J. MCGRATH, ESQ. AND SUPPORTING EXHIBI

6/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - UNOPPOSED STIPULATION OF THE 312 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTERS TO APPORTION SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER J. MCGRATH, ESQ. AND SUPPORTING EXHIBI

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling

6/7/2022: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/18/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RE: BOOTH LAW CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (A...)

5/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RE: BOOTH LAW CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (A...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/24/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ADOPTION FORM OF DEFENDANT JAMES M. HEAPS, M.D. AND DEFENDANT JAMES HEAPS MEDICAL CORPORATION AS TO JANE DOE AND JOHN DOE IN CASE NO. 21STCV47481

5/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ADOPTION FORM OF DEFENDANT JAMES M. HEAPS, M.D. AND DEFENDANT JAMES HEAPS MEDICAL CORPORATION AS TO JANE DOE AND JOHN DOE IN CASE NO. 21STCV47481

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATEMENT FOR MAY 24, 2022 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

5/17/2022: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATEMENT FOR MAY 24, 2022 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RE: PLAINTIFF #86...)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RE: PLAINTIFF #86...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MCGRATH KAVINOKY LLP MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS LODGED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

5/18/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MCGRATH KAVINOKY LLP MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS LODGED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/18/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MCGRATH KAVINOKY LLP'S MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS LODGED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

5/18/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MCGRATH KAVINOKY LLP'S MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS LODGED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/18/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1,752 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Docketat 2:22 PM in Department 7, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 7; Status Conference (to Demonstrate if Plaintiffs have Retained New Counsel (RePlaintiffs #0545, 0345, and 86)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketUnopposed Stipulation Of The 312 Settling Plaintiffs To Establish Qualified Settlement Fund, Appoint Hon Lisa Hart Cole (Ret.) As QSF Trustee And Appoint Epiq As QSF Administrator Declaration Of Jennifer J. Mcgrath And Supporting Exhibits Order; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketUnopposed Stipulation Of The 312 Settling Plaintiffs To Appoint Special Masters To Apportion Settlement Proceeds; Declaration Of Jennifer J. Mcgrath, Esq. And Supporting Exhibits; Order; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,845 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docketamended complaint; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THEODORA ORINGHER PC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAVINOKY DARREN TODD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARZA SHARYL BILAS