This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 00:52:33 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS PROMETHEUS GLOBEL MEDIA LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against PROMETHEUS GLOBEL MEDIA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1655

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants

PROMETHEUS GLOBEL MEDIA LLC DBA THE HOLLYWOOD REPORTER

ELDRIGE INDUSTRIES

JOHNSON SCOTT CAMERON

THE HOLLYWOOD REPORTER PROMETHEUS GLOBAL MEDIA LLC

P-MRC MUSIC LLC FKA PROMETHIUS GLOBAL MEDIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PENSKE JAY

PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

THE HOLLYWOOD REPORTER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LAIDMAN DANIEL A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

9/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRI...)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRI...)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/10/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE ISO DEFENDANTS' ISO SLAPP

8/20/2021: Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE ISO DEFENDANTS' ISO SLAPP

Request for Judicial Notice

8/20/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

8/20/2021: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

7/22/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/5/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE STIP TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE STIP TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/27/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) (to Second Amended Complaint;) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) (to Second Amended Complaint;) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Special Motion to Stri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for extension of time to serve pleadings) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for extension of time to serv...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for extension of time to serve pleadings); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1655 Hearing Date: September 16, 2021 Dept: 49

9. JANE DOE V. PROMETHEUS , ET AL: *******1655

Defendants’ motion to strike (Anti-SLAPP) with prejudice the second amended complaint

Off calendar. Plaintiff on September 10, 2021, filed a request for dismissal with prejudice of the complaint and entire action. It is not clear if the clerk’s office has already entered the dismissal as requested. If not, the court intends to do so at the hearing of this motion on September 16, 2021.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELDRIGE INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HOLLYWOOD REPORTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PROMETHEUS GLOBAL MEDIA LLC is a litigant