This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 15:53:52 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS MOHAMMED CATO, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS UCLA TITLE IX DIRECTOR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 JANE DOE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against MOHAMMED CATO, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS UCLA TITLE IX DIRECTOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2423

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOE JANE

Respondents

MOHAMMED CATO IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS UCLA TITLE IX DIRECTOR

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HATHAWAY MARK

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR PROHIBITION

6/27/2022: Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR PROHIBITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

6/29/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 85 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Doe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Jane Doe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPetition (Petition for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition); Filed by Jane Doe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Jane Doe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATHAWAY MARK