This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 06:53:23 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0417

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

WILSON MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSMA LAILA

Defendant Attorney

BIRTJA MICHELLE A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/22/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/22/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/22/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEEM PI COMPLICATED)

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEEM PI COMPLICATED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEEM PI COMPLICATED) OF 08/02/2022

8/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEEM PI COMPLICATED) OF 08/02/2022

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/26/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2023
  • Hearing12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docketat 09:14 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Deem PI Complicated)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Deem PI Complicated) of 08/02/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO THE COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF TREVOR C. WONG IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRTJA MICHELLE A.