This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 05:03:47 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0641

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

PEREZ WALTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAKH IVANNA

LEWIS JAMES W.

Defendant Attorney

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/5/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/29/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

8/2/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); Walter Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); As to: Walter Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); As to: Walter Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); Walter Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); Walter Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); Walter Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less