This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 14:57:07 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONALD F. FRANK and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0340

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RONALD F. FRANK

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DOBSON MITZIE L

Other Attorneys

BOOTH ROGER EVAN

NACHEF HANNAH MARIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 03/09/2023

3/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 03/09/2023

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference

2/7/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference

2/6/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2023

1/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2023

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJUR...) OF 01/12/2023

1/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJUR...) OF 01/12/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJUR...)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJUR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY DEFENDANT)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY DEFENDANT)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY DEFENDANT

1/9/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY DEFENDANT

Substitution of Attorney

5/31/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

8/19/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

8/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

8/27/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2024
  • Hearing03/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference) of 03/09/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 03/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 03/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jane Doe: Filed By: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); Result: Rejected; Result Date: 08/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Harbor-UCLA Medical Center (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Does 1-50 Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Harbor-UCLA Medical Center (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Does 1-50 Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Harbor-UCLA Medical Center (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Does 1-50 Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jane Doe: Status Date changed from 08/19/2021 to 08/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less