This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 21:09:37 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS HANGAR 18 LONG BEACH INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HANGAR 18 LONG BEACH INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3904

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 30

HANGAR 18 LONG BEACH INC

GILBERT CADE

HANGAR 18 LONG BEACH INC.

Guardian Ad Litems and Not Classified By Court

DREW P.

P. DREW

Minor

JANE DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BRISCOE J. JACKSON ESQ.

KITA GEORGE ESQ.

BRISCOE JOSEPH JACKSON IV

KITA GEORGE ISAO

Minor Attorney

RING DAVID M. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

RING DAVID MCDONALD

 

Court Documents

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

10/25/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5

7/8/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

7/8/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

7/8/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MIL #2

7/8/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MIL #2

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

7/8/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8

7/17/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8

Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

7/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE) OF 11/26/2019

11/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE) OF 11/26/2019

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

DECLARATION OF BITA M. AZIMI SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HANGAR 18 LONG BEACH, INC'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/7/2018: DECLARATION OF BITA M. AZIMI SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HANGAR 18 LONG BEACH, INC'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/22/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/9/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/9/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

3/29/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

SUMMONS -

4/6/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Funding of the Annuity) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Funding of the Annuity; Orde...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SONYA OSTOVAR RE: PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (of ruling and osc); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693904    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Jane Doe (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Drew P. (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant Hangar 18 Long Beach in exchange for $700,000.00. If approved, $0 will be used for medical expenses, $231,000.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $42,609.00 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $426,391.00 for Claimant, to be invested into a single-premium deferred annuity with Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the November 26, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RING DAVID M.