This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2023 at 20:13:43 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS EQUINOX HOLDINGS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 JANE DOE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EQUINOX HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID SOTELO, RICHARD J. BURDGE JR., DANIEL S. MURPHY and JOSEPH R. KALIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3140

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID SOTELO

RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.

DANIEL S. MURPHY

JOSEPH R. KALIN

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

DOE JANE

ESNER CHANG & BOYER

Claimant

NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Respondents and Defendants

EQUINOX HOLDINGS INC

MALLARD DEREK

Not Classified By Court

DAVIDSON #12823 GAIL R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRANDES CHRISTOPHER P.

GONZALES TIMOTHY J.

BROCK DONALD

TAYLOR JOHN C.

Claimant Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M.

Defendant Attorneys

DAUGHERTY MELISSA T.

KASPER ASHLEIGH REIF

SANCHEZ HENRY L.

BLACK DOROTHY L

LUTFEY KERRI RIANNE

MACKEY THOMAS G.

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT EQUINOX HOLDINGS INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OR EVIDENCE OF PAST LITIGATION INVOLVING EXPERT STEPHEN M. R

8/8/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT EQUINOX HOLDINGS INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OR EVIDENCE OF PAST LITIGATION INVOLVING EXPERT STEPHEN M. R

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. SEXUAL HARASSMENT; ETC

8/21/2017: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. SEXUAL HARASSMENT; ETC

Memorandum of Costs on Appeal

6/3/2022: Memorandum of Costs on Appeal

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED (B304083)

5/27/2022: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED (B304083)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/14/2022

3/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/14/2022

Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DEREK MALLARD'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REOPENING FACT DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF DEPOSING DETECTIVE PARRA, SARGENT J.D. BISHOP, AN

3/29/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DEREK MALLARD'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REOPENING FACT DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF DEPOSING DETECTIVE PARRA, SARGENT J.D. BISHOP, AN

Order - ORDER TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION OF PAULETTE RIGDON

4/3/2019: Order - ORDER TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION OF PAULETTE RIGDON

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS CATHLEEN WATERS AT TRIAL

7/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS CATHLEEN WATERS AT TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS MATTHEW HERBERT AT TRIAL

7/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS MATTHEW HERBERT AT TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS LESLIE LOGAN AT TRIAL

7/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS LESLIE LOGAN AT TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS HEIDI MADER AT TRIAL

7/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS HEIDI MADER AT TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DEREK MALLARD AT TRIAL

7/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DEREK MALLARD AT TRIAL

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DEPUTY ANTHONY COLEMAN FOR TRIAL

8/1/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DEPUTY ANTHONY COLEMAN FOR TRIAL

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ELENA KONSTAT, PH.D., VOLUME I, FOR TRIAL

8/1/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ELENA KONSTAT, PH.D., VOLUME I, FOR TRIAL

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ELEAN KONSTAT, PH.D., VOLUME II, FOR TRIAL

8/1/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ELEAN KONSTAT, PH.D., VOLUME II, FOR TRIAL

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF SERGEANT JEFFREY BISHOP FOR TRIAL

8/1/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF SERGEANT JEFFREY BISHOP FOR TRIAL

Exhibit List

8/7/2019: Exhibit List

288 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by: Equinox Holdings, Inc. (Respondent); As to: Jane DOE (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B304083): As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B304083); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/14/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Defendant Derek Mallard's Ex Parte Application and Application for an Order Reopening Fact Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Deposing Detective Parra, Sargent J.D. Bishop, and Deputy Coleman: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Defendant Derek Mallard's Ex Parte Application and Application for an Order Reopening Fact Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Deposing Detective Parra, Sargent J.D. Bishop, and Deputy Coleman: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Paulette Rigdon: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Paulette Rigdon: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
484 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-10-23 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause David Sotelo 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketDocument:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 12/11/17 at 8:31 am David Sotelo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Order to Show Cause 10/23/17 at 8:30 am David Sotelo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Wrongful Termination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less