This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 16:27:48 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS ACTIVISION BLIZZARD, INC.. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On March 23, 2022, Jane Doe (“Plaintiff” or “Ms. Doe”), represented by Lisa Bloom and Alan Goldstein, filed a civil action against Activision Blizzard, Inc.; Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.; Mark Skorupa; Derek Ingalls; Benjamin “Ben” Kilgore; Sonal Patel; Danny Nguyen; and Does 1 through 25 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages along with pre- and post- judgment interest for the Defendants’ alleged sexual harassment. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Los Angeles County Superior Court.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “ACTIVISION BLIZZARD purchased alcohol for its employees to drink during work hours, offering it nearly everywhere, including kegs of beer throughout the offices and on campus. In this alcohol-sotted work environment, sexual harassment flourished. ACTIVISION BLIZZARD often pressured Ms. Doe and others to participate in office “cube crawls” where women would be subjected to sexual comments and groped.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On October 4, 2018, Ms. Doe complained to HR about Defendant SKORUPA’s sexual harassment. HR said that it was Defendant SKORUPA’s way of complimenting her and that she should stop saying that it is sexual harassment. She also reported Defendant INGALLS’ comments about sleeping with one’s administrators and she played a recording of the comments. HR said to not let this get out because it could be very damaging and he would take care of it. He did not.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “In November 2021, Ms. Doe interviewed for an open Executive Assistant position. On December 8, 2021, Ms. Doe spoke at a press conference about the sexual harassment, discrimination, and retaliation she has endured at ACTIVISION BLIZZARD. A week later, in retaliation, ACTIVISION BLIZZARD rejected her application. On December 17, 2021, Ms. Doe sent an e-mail requesting feedback about the interview. She received no response.”

 

There are seven claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first and second claims alleged are for hostile work environment and Quid Pro Quo pertaining to sexual harassment pursuant to GOV. CODE § 12940. The third claim alleged is for failure to prevent harassment (GOV. CODE § 12940(k)). The fourth claim alleged is for sexual favoritism (GOV. CODE § 12940). The fifth claim alleged is for retaliation (GOV. CODE § 12940(h)). The sixth claim alleged is for sexual battery (CAL. CIVIL CODE § 1708.5). The seventh claim alleged is for intentional infliction of emotional distress. 

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for an order requiring ACTIVISION BLIZZARD to waive all arbitration of sexual harassment and gender discrimination; implement a rotating Human Resource department; implement an investigation policy; implement an anti-retaliation policy; prohibiting Mark Skorupa from physical, virtual contact with the Plaintiff; amend Plaintiff’s 2020 performance review to accurately reflect a “Successful” rating; and to retroactively compensate her based on the salary, profit sharing and equity owed to her had her 2020 performance review accurately reflected a “Successful” rating; and promote the Plaintiff to executive assistant and increase the annual pay, equity and profit sharing of the Plaintiff. The Plaintiff further requested that the Court award general and punitive damages and impairment of earning capacity along with past and future medical expenses, costs and attorneys’ fees or any other relief that the Court deems appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0064

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants

ACTIVISION BLIZZARD INC.. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLIZZARD ENTERTAINMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

INGALLS DEREK

KILGORE BENJAMIN AKA BEN KILGORE

NGUYEN DANNY

PATEL SONAL

SKORUPA MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLOOM LISA

GOLDSTEIN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blizzard Entertainment Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ACTIVISION BLIZZARD INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOOM LISA