This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2022 at 10:42:15 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS 7-ELEVEN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7-ELEVEN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1333

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE

Defendants

SEVEN & I. HOLDINGS CO. LTD

DOE 1 DOE 1

7-ELEVEN INC.

SOHOO INC.

SOHOO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SEVEN & I. HOLDINGS CO. LTD A PARENT COMPANY A JAPANESE CORPORATION

7-ELEVEN INC. A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAFFER DOUGLAS D.

SHAFFER DOUGLAS DURAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HART JR. JAMES P.

HART JR. JAMES P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/8/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/19/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST 7-ELEVEN, INC. FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST 7-ELEVEN, INC. FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/22/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR

4/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

4/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

4/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/30/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/2/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

4/2/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

PI General Order

2/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. a Corporation, doing business in California (Defendant); SOHOO, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. a Corporation, doing business in California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. a Corporation, doing business in California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Striking Punitive Damages Against 7-Eleven, Inc. from First Amended Complaint); Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. a Corporation, doing business in California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Demurrer & Motion to Strike Off Calendar); Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading) (TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT;); Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (To Complaint;); Filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JANE DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEVEN & I. HOLDINGS CO. LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where 7-ELEVEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFFER DOUGLAS D.