Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 06:49:34 (UTC).

JANE DOE, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, RAQUEL ACOSTA VS ALHAMBRA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 JANE DOE, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, RAQUEL ACOSTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALHAMBRA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9446

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE DOE A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM RAQUEL ACOSTA

Defendant

ALHAMBRA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH BRIAN J.

Defendant Attorney

FOX DANA ALDEN

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/19/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/30/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/18/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/22/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alhambra Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jane Doe); Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Jane Doe Z.R.); Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JANE DOE, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, RAQUEL ACOSTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALHAMBRA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH