This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 18:18:05 (UTC).

JANE DOE 8, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 JANE DOE 8, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK H. EPSTEIN and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0181

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK H. EPSTEIN

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE 8 AN INDIVIDUAL JANE

Defendants

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CORPORATION

WIESMEIER AN INDIVIDUAL DR. EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAVINOKY DARREN TODD

MCGRATH JENNIFER J.

Defendant Attorneys

LUSKEY RANDALL

RHEE JEANNIE S.

SHIK OLEG M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

3/22/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2022

3/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2022

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2022

Answer

3/28/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/28/2022

2/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/28/2022

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE EXTENSION FOR THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

3/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE EXTENSION FOR THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT OF CASE) OF 02/22/2022

2/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT OF CASE) OF 02/22/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT OF CASE)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT OF CASE)

Notice of Appearance

1/27/2022: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/27/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF OLEG M. SHIK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL

1/27/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF OLEG M. SHIK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

1/27/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/27/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/12/2022: PI General Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, a California government corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 03/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jane Doe 8, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Extension for the Regents of the University of California to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint); Filed by THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, a California government corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docketat 11:48 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, a California government corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (OF OLEG M. SHIK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL); Filed by Oleg M. Shik (Attorney); THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, a California government corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jane Doe 8, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jane Doe 8, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe 8, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Doe 8, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe 8, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUSKEY RANDALL