This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 19:49:16 (UTC).

JANE DOE 5, ET AL. VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 JANE DOE 5 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2627

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE 5 JANE

DOE 6 JANE

Defendant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Not Classified By Court

DOE 1 JANE

DOE 2 JANE

DOE 3 JANE

DOE 4 JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

RING DAVID M.

TAYLOR JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

PRECIADO ARTHUR

BACIO GARY ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Related Case

9/17/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case

10/26/2021: Notice of Related Case

Answer

10/26/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

2/9/2022: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

3/1/2022: Substitution of Attorney

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2024
  • Hearing08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 1 (Non-Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe 5 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 6 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR JOHN