This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 19:39:22 (UTC).

JANE DOE 2, ET AL. VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 JANE DOE 2 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0433

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE 3 JANE

DOE 4 JANE

DOE 2 JANE

Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

MORENO LOUIS

Not Classified By Court

DOE 1 JANE

DOES 5-6 JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAGAN PETER A.

Defendant Attorney

PRECIADO ARTHUR

Not Classified By Court Attorney

TAYLOR JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/19/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/16/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jane Doe 2 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 3 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jane Doe 2 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 3 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jane Doe 2 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 3 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jane Doe 2 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 3 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jane Doe 2 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 3 (Plaintiff); Jane Doe 4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR JOHN