This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2023 at 11:13:06 (UTC).

JANE DOE 1 VS HARVEY WEINSTEIN

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 JANE DOE 1 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARVEY WEINSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0591

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE 1 JANE

Defendant

WEINSTEIN HARVEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RING DAVID M.

Defendant Attorneys

BONJEAN JENNIFER

COHEN ASHLEY

FREEDMAN MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/20/2023

7/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/20/2023

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT HARVEY WEINSTEIN'S FINANCIAL CONDITION PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 3295(C)

7/20/2023: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT HARVEY WEINSTEIN'S FINANCIAL CONDITION PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 3295(C)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/26/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER BON JEAN

6/9/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER BON JEAN

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF ASHLEY COHEN

6/9/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF ASHLEY COHEN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED ...)

6/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FREEDMAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

6/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FREEDMAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER BONJEAN AND ASHLEY COHEN

6/2/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER BONJEAN AND ASHLEY COHEN

Case Management Statement

5/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO APPLICATIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

5/25/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO APPLICATIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

5/17/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Answer

5/1/2023: Answer

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

5/1/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/22/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

3/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2024
  • Hearing05/10/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion - Other Financial Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- David M. Ring (Attorney): First Name changed from John to David; Last Name changed from Taylor to Ring; Middle Name: M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketAddress for David M. Ring (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketMotion for Order ALLOWING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT HARVEY WEINSTEIN'S FINANCIAL CONDITION PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 3295(C); Filed by: Jane Doe 1 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Financial Discovery scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department P - Hon. Elaine W. Mandel; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jane Doe 1 (Plaintiff); As to: Harvey Weinstein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jane Doe 1 (Plaintiff); As to: Harvey Weinstein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jane Doe 1 (Plaintiff); As to: Harvey Weinstein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 23SMCV00591 Hearing Date: June 9, 2023 Dept: P

Tentative Ruling

Jane Doe v. Harvey Weinstein, Case No. 23SMCV00591

Hearing Date June 9, 2023

Defendants’ Motions for Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

New York attorneys Jennifer Bonjean and Ashley Cohen move to be admitted pro hac vice for defendant Harvey Weinstein. Their verified applications contain all statements required under Cal. Rule of Court 9.40(d).

California Rule of Court 9.40(b) states “[a]bsent special circumstances, repeated appearances by any person under this rule is a cause for denial of an application.”

Plaintiff Doe opposes on the grounds that Bonjean has been granted pro hac vice status in California twice in the past two years, and there are no special circumstances present. Plaintiff argues it would disrupt the orderly process of justice to allow Bonjean and Cohen to represent Weinstein in this case while also representing him in his ongoing criminal appeal.

Appearing pro hac vice three times in two years does not constitute “repeated appearances” under Rule 9.40(b), so no special circumstances must be shown under Rule 9.40(b). Allowing the same attorney to represent a defendant in two related civil and criminal matters does not threaten to “disrupt the orderly process of justice.” GRANTED.