This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 04:07:07 (UTC).

JANE BR DOE, VS DOE ARCHDIOCESE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 JANE BR DOE, filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOE ARCHDIOCESE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0939

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JANE BR

Defendants

DOE ARCHDIOCESE

DOE DIOCESE

PERPETRATOR DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOREN TAYLOR

Defendant Attorneys

HENNIGAN JAMES MICHAEL

MURPHY MICHAEL C.

NATELBORG KENNETH MARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) RE DISMISSAL

9/11/2023: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFF OBTAINING NEW COUNSEL)

9/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFF OBTAINING NEW COUNSEL)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/31/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) - CIVIL

8/25/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) - CIVIL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT

8/1/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, AND SCHEDULING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

7/26/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, AND SCHEDULING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

7/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS TO COUNSEL TAY...)

7/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS TO COUNSEL TAY...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

6/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BELLWETHER DEPOSITION PROTOCOL)

Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/30/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/23/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/23/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2023
  • Hearing10/27/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of OSC (Name Extension) Re Dismissal; Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Plaintiff Obtaining New Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Civil; Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/25/2023 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Jane BR Does Certificate of Merit (Mental Health Practitioner), Pursuant to C.C.P. 340.1(G)(2); Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe Perpetrator, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Jane BR Does Certificate of Merit (Attorney), Re: Doe Archdiocese, Pursuant to C.C.P. 340.1(G)(1); Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe Perpetrator, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Jane BR Does Certificate of Merit (Attorney), Re: Doe Diocese, Pursuant to C.C.P. 340.1(G)(1); Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe Perpetrator, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe Perpetrator, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe Perpetrator, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Jane BR Does Certificate of Merit (Attorney), Re: Doe Perpetrator, Pursuant to C.C.P. 340.1(G)(1); Filed by: Jane BR Doe, (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe Perpetrator, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less