This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 04:25:40 (UTC).

JANE ANN STEWART FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 23, 2014

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 JANE ANN STEWART FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 23, 2014 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4988

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KRIVACS JANE

SCHILD DAVID

Respondents

AQUINO JAYSON

ORIGINS HOME HEALTH CARE INC.

TANUYAN HERMOGINES

TANUYAN JUANITA SHIRLEY V.

Not Classified By Court

JANE ANN STEWART FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HOFFMAN NATHAN BERRY

STOLLER LORENZO CARRA

Respondent Attorneys

KINCHELOE JUSTIN MICHAEL

HERBERT DANIEL BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Objection - Trust Petition - Response of Jayson Aquino to [First]Amended Petition for Confirmation of Trust Asset(s) and Transfer

8/29/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - Response of Jayson Aquino to [First]Amended Petition for Confirmation of Trust Asset(s) and Transfer

Objection - Trust Petition - to Amended Petition for: 1) Confirmation of Trust Assets

8/26/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - to Amended Petition for: 1) Confirmation of Trust Assets

Minute Order

5/18/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/18/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/18/2022: Minute Order

Reply - Reply

5/11/2022: Reply - Reply

Reply - Reply to Opposition to Demurrer

5/10/2022: Reply - Reply to Opposition to Demurrer

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing-mailing

8/3/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing-mailing

Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service-Aquino and Origins

8/24/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service-Aquino and Origins

Proof of Service

8/25/2021: Proof of Service

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Diligence re Service J. Tanuyan

9/14/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Diligence re Service J. Tanuyan

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Diligence re Service H. Tanuyan

9/14/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Diligence re Service H. Tanuyan

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Amended Petition Confirmation of Trust Assets & etc

10/6/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Amended Petition Confirmation of Trust Assets & etc

Minute Order

10/7/2021: Minute Order

Request - Special Notice - Send Notice to Attorney

10/12/2021: Request - Special Notice - Send Notice to Attorney

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing-Amended Ptn

12/16/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing-Amended Ptn

Notice - Hearing

1/13/2022: Notice - Hearing

Demurrer - Demurrer to amended petition;

2/2/2022: Demurrer - Demurrer to amended petition;

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Response of Jayson Aquino to [First]Amended Petition for Confirmation of Trust Asset(s) and Transfer ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (to Amended Petition for: 1) Confirmation of Trust Assets ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Demurrer Hearing - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Demurrer Hearing - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (The Demurrer filed on 2/2/2022 by Petitioner(s) Jayson Aquino is granted-in-part, denied-in-part )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Declaration of Diligence re Service J. Tanuyan ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Declaration of Diligence re Service H. Tanuyan ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service-Aquino and Origins ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing-mailing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Confirmation of Trust Assets ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less