This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 02:20:50 (UTC).

JAN GRAHAM VS BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 JAN GRAHAM filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3578

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM JAN

Defendants

BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.

PREMIER BRANDS OF AMERICA INC.

CHATTEM INC.

SANOFI S.A.

SANOFI US SERVICES INC.

GARCOA INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

THORNTON INDUSTRIES INC.

DOLGEN CALIFORNIA LLC

DAVION INC.

WALGREEN CO.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

STONE ARCH CAPITAL LLC

WALMART INC.

TARGET CORPORATION

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION

DOLGEN LLC

TARGET BRANDS INC.

CVS PHARMACY INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABTAHI ALI

FOLEY CRYSTAL

MIRACLE TRENT B.

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIS ANNE MARIE

GARSON EDWARD

GIGOUNAS GEORGE JOHN

GUO YUCHEN

HARRISON STACY WEINSTEIN

MILLER NAVDEEP

SPERLA GREGORY GEORGE

WAGNER WILLIS M.

WASSERMAN RENEE DEVON

WOLENSKY GARY ALAN

BICKS PETER A.

ECHTMAN ELYSE D.

ANGKADJAJA STEPHANIE

MARGULIES JEFFREY

VAN WYNGARDEN THOMAS L.

NEWMAN DANIELL KAI

Other Attorneys

BREIT MITCHELL M.

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

9/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AGAINST GARCOA, INC.

7/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AGAINST GARCOA, INC.

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COSTS AND APPEAL

6/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COSTS AND APPEAL

Notice of Entry of Judgment

6/2/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Judgment

5/26/2021: Judgment

Order - ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/26/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER AND JUDGMENT SUBMITTED B...)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER AND JUDGMENT SUBMITTED B...)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

5/18/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/18/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE P. DOMINGUEZ, CSR #12523

5/4/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE P. DOMINGUEZ, CSR #12523

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE VIA CASEANYWHERE RE MOVING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALI ABTAHI IN OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUD

4/28/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE VIA CASEANYWHERE RE MOVING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALI ABTAHI IN OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUD

Response - MOVING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALI ABTAHI IN OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/28/2021: Response - MOVING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALI ABTAHI IN OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Request for Judicial Notice - MOVING DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/28/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - MOVING DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON JOINDER TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICAT...)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON JOINDER TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICAT...)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALI ABTAHI IN OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/21/2021: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALI ABTAHI IN OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE P. DOMINGUEZ, CSR #12523

4/14/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE P. DOMINGUEZ, CSR #12523

Response - DEFENDANT DAVION, INC. AND THORNTON INDUSTRIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DAVION, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDI

4/7/2021: Response - DEFENDANT DAVION, INC. AND THORNTON INDUSTRIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DAVION, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDI

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Notice of Renewal Application/Fee for Pro Hac Vices Peter A. Bicks and Elyse D. Echtman) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Notice of Renewal Application/Fee for Pro Hac Vice Mitchell M. Breit and Trent B. Miracle) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Notice of Renewal/Renewal Fee of Pro Hac Vice Thien An Vinh Truong) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Notice of Renewal/Payment of Renewal Fees for Pro Hac Vice James L. Ward, Jr.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by Jan Graham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Dismissing all Claims Against Garcoa, Inc.); Filed by Jan Graham (Plaintiff); Garcoa, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Regarding Costs and Appeal); Filed by Jan Graham (Plaintiff); Bausch Health Companies Inc. (Defendant); Bausch Health U.S. LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order Granting Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Walmart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Mitchell M. Breit); Filed by Mitchell M. Breit (Attorney); Jan Graham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Trent B. Miracle); Filed by Trent B. Miracle (Attorney); Jan Graham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Order Reassigning Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 02/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jan Graham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jan Graham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARCOA INC. is a litigant