This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 08:05:37 (UTC).

JAMILAH DODD VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 JAMILAH DODD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6377

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DODD JAMILAH

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT

DOES 1 TO 100

GUTIERREZ NICHOLAS JOSEPH

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGUYEN JIMMY T.

Defendant Attorney

THAMMALAIVIROJ PATTY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/15/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/15/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/15/2022: Complaint

Answer

10/21/2022: Answer

Answer

10/21/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/21/2022: Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2024
  • Hearing08/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); As to: JAMILAH DODD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); NICHOLAS JOSEPH GUTIERREZ (Defendant); As to: JAMILAH DODD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); As to: ROES 1-10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JAMILAH DODD (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); NICHOLAS JOSEPH GUTIERREZ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JAMILAH DODD (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); NICHOLAS JOSEPH GUTIERREZ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JAMILAH DODD (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); NICHOLAS JOSEPH GUTIERREZ (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less