This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 02:12:26 (UTC).

JAMIE SOLIS VS DEBORAH LINDRUD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 JAMIE SOLIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEBORAH LINDRUD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0164

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLIS JAMIE

Defendants

LINDRUD DEBORAH

LINDRUD JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HESAM

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/12/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JAMIE SOLIS (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH LINDRUD (Defendant); JENNIFER LINDRUD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JAMIE SOLIS (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH LINDRUD (Defendant); JENNIFER LINDRUD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JAMIE SOLIS (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH LINDRUD (Defendant); JENNIFER LINDRUD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less