This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 02:16:26 (UTC).

JAMIE HARNAGE VS APPLEBEE'S RESTAURANTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 JAMIE HARNAGE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against APPLEBEE'S RESTAURANTS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2487

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARNAGE JAMIE

Defendants

APPLEBEE'S INTERNATIONAL INC.

APPLEBEE'S RESTAURANTS LLC

DINE BRAND GLOBAL INC.

APPLE MID CAL II LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLE TERRY J

Defendant Attorneys

RIVERA DIANA

MURPHY JACQUELINE CARROLL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/12/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/12/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/12/2022: Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/19/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

8/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/12/2022: Answer

Association of Attorney

3/7/2023: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIDENTIALITY OF INFORMATION

5/31/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIDENTIALITY OF INFORMATION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2024
  • Hearing07/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketNotice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order; Filed by: Apple Mid Cal II LLC (Defendant); As to: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Confidentiality of Information; Signed and Filed by: Apple Mid Cal II LLC (Defendant); As to: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Confidentiality of Information: Filed By: Apple Mid Cal II LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Apple Mid Cal II LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Apple Mid Cal II LLC (Defendant); As to: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jamie Harnage on 07/12/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jamie Harnage as to Applebee's Restaurants, LLC, Applebee's International, Inc., and Dine Brand Global, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff); As to: Applebee's Restaurants, LLC (Defendant); Applebee's International, Inc. (Defendant); Dine Brand Global, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff); As to: Applebee's Restaurants, LLC (Defendant); Applebee's International, Inc. (Defendant); Dine Brand Global, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff); As to: Applebee's Restaurants, LLC (Defendant); Applebee's International, Inc. (Defendant); Dine Brand Global, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jamie Harnage (Plaintiff); As to: Applebee's Restaurants, LLC (Defendant); Applebee's International, Inc. (Defendant); Dine Brand Global, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less