This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2020 at 15:57:50 (UTC).

JAMIE E. ESTRADA VS BARONHR, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 JAMIE E ESTRADA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BARONHR, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5043

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA JAMIE E.

Defendants

BARONHR INC.

PALMERI PIZZA

BARONHR-VENSURE LLC

BARONHR LLC

PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP LLC

VENICE BAKERY

BISON WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS INC.

SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC.

INNOVATIVE BAKERY

STAY SAFE STAFFING INC. DBA HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES

BARONHR TECHNICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/2/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Initial Status Conference Order

10/30/2019: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/30/2019, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

10/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/30/2019, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

1/27/2020: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • Hearing03/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jamie E. Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jamie E. Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Jamie E. Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 11:01 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: setting Initial Status Conference) of 10/30/2019, initial status conference order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jamie E. Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jamie E. Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAY SAFE STAFFINGINC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, LLC D/B/A BARNETT MANAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant