This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 10:44:40 (UTC).

JAMIE ARNETT VS JUAN JOSE BOJORGE ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 JAMIE ARNETT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN JOSE BOJORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2074

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNETT JAMIE

Defendants

BOJORGE JUAN JOSE

JARQUIN TRUCKING

JARQUIN MARVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS STEVEN D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PANOSYAN SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

9/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/10/2020

7/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIF...)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIF...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING DEFNDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

6/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING DEFNDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION RECEIVED FROM ANY PARTY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

6/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION RECEIVED FROM ANY PARTY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Notice - NOTICE SECOND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

6/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE SECOND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL

3/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA D. PANOSYAN

2/24/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA D. PANOSYAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

Answer

12/2/2019: Answer

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JAMIE ARNETT on 11/03/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jamie Arnett as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Juan Jose Bojorge (Defendant); Marvin Jarquin (Defendant); Jarquin Trucking (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to 03/16/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAddress for Steven D. Ross, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Firm Address; Filed by: Jamie Arnett (Plaintiff); As to: Jamie Arnett (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 4B - Hon. Laura A. Seigleeffective 12/31/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 04/19/2019 Final Status Conference: Location changed from Department 7 to Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 05/03/2019 Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 7 to Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 11/03/2020 Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal: Location changed from Department 7 to Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 04/19/19 at 10:00 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 05/03/19 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 11/03/20 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2074    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAMIE ARNETT,

Plaintiff,

vs.

JUAN JOSE BOJORGE, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

) )

.: ****2074

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

June 29, 2020

On November 3, 2017, plaintiff Jamie Arnett (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Juan Jose Bojorge Jarquin Trucking, and Marvin Jarquin dba Jarquin Trucking (collectively, “Defendants”) arising from a November 4, 2015 motor vehicle accident.  On December 4, 2019, Defendants served Form Interrogatories (Set One), Special Interrogatories (Set One), Requests for Production of Documents (Set One), and Request for Statement of Damages on Plaintiff.  No responses were received.  On July 19, Defendants sent Plaintiff a letter requesting responses.  Defendants did not receive a response and filed these motions on August 2, 2019.  

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses.  (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.)   A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product.  (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).)  Unlike a motion to compel further responses, a motion to compel responses is not subject to a 45-day time limit and the propounding party has no meet and confer obligations.  (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc., supra, 148 Cal.App.4th at p. 404.)

When a complaint is filed in an action to recover damages for personal injury or wrongful death, the defendant may at any time request a statement setting forth the nature and amount of damages being sought. (Code Civ. Proc. ; 425.11(b).)  The request shall be served upon the plaintiff, who shall serve a responsive statement as to the damages within 15 days. Id.) A defendant may petition a Court to order Plaintiff to serve a responsive statement of damages. Id.

Plaintiff does not oppose this Motion and it is undisputed that Plaintiff failed to serve discovery responses.  However, Defendants only filed one discovery motion seeking to compel responses to three sets of discovery.  Accordingly, Defendants’ Motion is GRANTED on the condition that Defendants pay two additional filing fees before the hearing date; Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Defendants’ Form Interrogatories (Set One), Special Interrogatories (Set One), and Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.  

The Court also orders Plaintiff to serve a responsive statement of damages within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. 

Where the court grants a motion to compel responses, sanctions shall be imposed against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust.  (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).)  Defendants’ request for sanctions is GRANTED and the Court imposes sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of $380.00, consisting of 3 hours at defense counsel’s hourly rate of $200.00 and $180.00 in filing fees.  

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 29th day of June 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court