This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 03:00:22 (UTC).

JAMI RENE THOMPSON VS JAMES PERKINS ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 JAMI RENE THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES PERKINS ROBINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0801

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON JAMI RENE

Defendant

ROBINSON JAMES PERKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT DANIEL M.

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG EL MAHDI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/11/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/12/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE]

10/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE]

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

11/16/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant); As to: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant); As to: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant); Service Date: 10/17/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from James Perkins Robinson (Defendant) to James Perkins Robinson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/09/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department X to Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret L. Oldendorf in Department P Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jami Rene Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: James Perkins Robinson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT DANIEL