Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 10:49:45 (UTC).

JAMES YOUNG MOON VS ANTHONY MARCOS AGUILAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 JAMES YOUNG MOON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY MARCOS AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1672

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOON JAMES YOUNG

Defendants

A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

A NEW YORK CORPORATION

AGUILAR ANTHONY MARCOS

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

STANTEC CONSULTING SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIN TIFFANY SEONG

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/17/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by james young moon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by james young moon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by james young moon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a New York corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where STANTEC CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., a Florida corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant