This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 05:33:27 (UTC).

JAMES WEIGH VS MICHEL MOORE, , CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 JAMES WEIGH filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against MICHEL MOORE, , CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2228

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEIGH JAMES

Respondents and Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

MOORE MICHEL CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MELLK GIDIAN RACHEL

Respondent Attorney

PARK HOON SUK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

2/1/2022: Notice of Ruling

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER

1/19/2022: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER

1/19/2022: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GIDIAN R. MELLK

9/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GIDIAN R. MELLK

Notice of Status Conference and Order

9/29/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] INTERLOCUTORY ORDER

9/29/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] INTERLOCUTORY ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE INTERLOCUTORY ORDER

9/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE INTERLOCUTORY ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

10/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Brief - BRIEF PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF

7/9/2021: Brief - BRIEF PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF

Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/6/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Reply - REPLY PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF

8/18/2021: Reply - REPLY PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

8/18/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

Notice of Ruling

9/15/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docketat 12:30 PM in Department 82; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement (NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER); Filed by Michel Moore, , Chief of Police of the City of Los Angeles (Respondent); City of Los Angeles, a Municipal Corporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement (NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER); Filed by Michel Moore, , Chief of Police of the City of Los Angeles (Respondent); City of Los Angeles, a Municipal Corporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder (Interlocutory Order); Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Original Proof of Service Re Interlocutory Order); Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by James Weigh (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLK GIDIAN RACHEL