This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2022 at 10:26:00 (UTC).

JAMES SHAYLER VS FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 JAMES SHAYLER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0325

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAYLER JAMES

Defendants

EDISON REUBEN

FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR. JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

DOSS BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/7/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

2/28/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

2/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/25/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

5/24/2022: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Mail

6/7/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/24/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

7/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by James Shayler on 12/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by James Shayler as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/13/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/29/2021; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from REUBEN EDISON (Defendant) to REUBEN EDISON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by James Shayler on 12/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by James Shayler as to REUBEN EDISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); REUBEN EDISON (Defendant); SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); REUBEN EDISON (Defendant); SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: James Shayler (Plaintiff); As to: FAR WEST RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); REUBEN EDISON (Defendant); SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department A Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less