Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2020 at 13:20:18 (UTC).

JAMES SEBASTIANI VS MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 JAMES SEBASTIANI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7737

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEBASTIANI JAMES

Defendant

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOENIG CHRISTOPHER J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/22/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/23/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by James Sebastiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Sebastiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Sebastiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Sebastiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant